U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02248
  • Case Name: Dines v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 02, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings of the Same Type - Public]
  • December 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • July 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 08, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 24, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.