U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02249
  • Case Name: Prairie Pointe Orthodontics, P.A. v. ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [ADR Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Discovery Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 25, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 26, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 26, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 26, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.