U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01142
  • Case Name: Fleeman v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Setting Scheduling Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 12, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 06, 2022: [Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 28, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 28, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 28, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.