U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03129
  • Case Name: Harlin v. USP Leavenworth
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • July 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • July 15, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • June 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.