U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02253
  • Case Name: Moore v. Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • January 18, 2023: [ADR Report]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 19, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
  • July 15, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.