U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03131
  • Case Name: Gibson (ID 124179) v. Schnurr
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Letter re Record Complete]
  • December 23, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • December 09, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • December 08, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • November 04, 2022: [Traverse]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • June 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.