U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02255
  • Case Name: VanWye v. Arrow Cleaners & Dryers, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 21, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 18, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.