U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04036
  • Case Name: Blood et al v. Labette County Medical Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Electronic Filing Registration Form in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 26, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 26, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 12, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • July 05, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • June 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.