U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03132
  • Case Name: Cheatham v. Dedeke et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 20, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 11, 2023: [Preliminary Injunction]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 05, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 23, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 10, 2022: [Default Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Produce]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Appeal]
  • October 07, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Response]
  • September 23, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • September 23, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • September 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • September 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 22, 2022: [Clarify]
  • September 21, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 09, 2022: [Martinez Report]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.