U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02257
  • Case Name: Marshall v. Leavenworth County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Administratively Closing Case]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [ADR Report]
  • December 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 22, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.