U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01143
  • Case Name: Magner v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • November 09, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 29, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 29, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.