U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03134
  • Case Name: Gaines (ID 62509) v. Zmuda
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 28, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • July 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • June 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 30, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 30, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.