U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01145
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Textron Aviation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 06, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.