U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01144
  • Case Name: Ashenfelter et al v. Escott Aerial Spraying, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • July 28, 2022: [Stay Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 26, 2022: [Joinder]
  • July 26, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 26, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 26, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Remand]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 05, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • July 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 29, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.