U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03135
  • Case Name: Collins v. Wichita, Kansas, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Petition]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Modify]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • August 12, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • July 14, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 07, 2022: [Supplement]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • June 30, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.