U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02258
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 16, 2022: [Mediation Minute Order]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct Document]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 06, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Waiver]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.