U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03137
  • Case Name: Chambers v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Mandate]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
  • July 15, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • July 15, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • July 15, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • July 01, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.