U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02260
  • Case Name: Henry v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Social Security - Commissioners Response Brief]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 13, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • August 03, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 05, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.