U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04019
  • Case Name: Mettille v. Prairie Express, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Supplement]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Default Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 09, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.