U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03139
  • Case Name: Castaneda v. Great Bend Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2022: [Stay Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.