U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01146
  • Case Name: Moccaldi v. Pratt City Ford, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Joint Mediation Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 05, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.