U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02261
  • Case Name: Temple et al v. Ghadimi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 19, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Setting Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
  • January 04, 2023: [Stay Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 05, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.