U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02263
  • Case Name: Sunday v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 11, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • July 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 06, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.