U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02262
  • Case Name: Rose v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • December 01, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.