U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04037
  • Case Name: Bryson v. Wichita, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • August 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • July 20, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 06, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.