U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01147
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $15,000.00 in United States Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Return of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 23, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • November 23, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • November 10, 2022: [Status Report Order]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Warrant for Arrest of Property]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.