U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02264
  • Case Name: Stallings v. Renzenberger, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Set Aside]
  • December 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 07, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 19, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 09, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.