U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01148
  • Case Name: Gradeless v. Kansas State University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 08, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 01, 2022: [Reassigning Case - Minute]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 07, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.