U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02265
  • Case Name: Soetaert v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 12, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Reassigning Case - Minute]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 08, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.