U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03141
  • Case Name: Cooley v. Douglas County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response to Order]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • July 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.