U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02266
  • Case Name: Crumbl LLC et al v. Recreational Rentals of New Mexico, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • January 05, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 08, 2022: [AO Form 120 Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark]
  • July 08, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 08, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.