U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02267
  • Case Name: LEONARD et al v. HMG PARK MANOR OF SALINA, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 27, 2022: [Amend/Correct Document]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 14, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 26, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • September 17, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 01, 2022: [Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 19, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • July 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 09, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • July 09, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.