U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02268
  • Case Name: Gant v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 30, 2022: [Social Security - Commissioners Response Brief]
  • December 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 11, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.