U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02269
  • Case Name: United States of America v. West et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 11, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.