U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01151
  • Case Name: Stone v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Reply Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Social Security - Commissioners Response Brief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • September 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 27, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 12, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.