U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02270
  • Case Name: Laminate Works, Inc. v. Professional Installation Network, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.