U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-mj-90043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parsons
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • October 25, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • October 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 13, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.