U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • October 25, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • October 25, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • October 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 13, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • July 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.