U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01152
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Dunn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 09, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 08, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • September 13, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • August 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • August 17, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • August 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 13, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.