U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02271
  • Case Name: Allen v. Kretzer, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 12, 2022: [Mediation Minute Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 19, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • August 08, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 12, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.