U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02273
  • Case Name: Watkins v. Genesh, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - Public]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 01, 2022: [Reassigning Case - Minute]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.