U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02275
  • Case Name: Kitchen v. Genesh, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - Public]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 10, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 04, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 20, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 15, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.