U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01153
  • Case Name: Nambo v. Wichita, City of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 28, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • July 26, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • July 26, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sealed Document - use ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 18, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.