U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03147
  • Case Name: Evans v. Kansas, State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order of 10CCA]
  • September 20, 2022: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter from 10CCA]
  • September 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • August 23, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • August 23, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • July 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.