U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02277
  • Case Name: Warner v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • January 03, 2023: [Remand to Agency]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • September 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 18, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.