U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02278
  • Case Name: Peak v. Yellow Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 28, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • December 14, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Amend Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • August 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.