U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02281
  • Case Name: Millard v. Olathe Health System, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Unsealing of Provisionally Sealed Document]
  • January 02, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • December 20, 2022: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 10, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.