U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02280
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ultreras et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 24, 2023: [Service by Publication]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • November 17, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • November 17, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • November 10, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • October 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.