U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02279
  • Case Name: Wood et al v. Miller Investment Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 17, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 17, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • July 21, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.