U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01156
  • Case Name: Yaeger v. Hurd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 17, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 28, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • August 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.